LA SB447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to coroners. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to coroners. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 447 FINAL PASSAGE (#307) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |