LA SB442 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain third-party sellers on the online marketplace. (1/1/23)
Title
Provides relative to certain third-party sellers on the online marketplace. (1/1/23)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] | Sen. Mark Abraham [R] | Sen. Patrick Connick [R] | Sen. Jimmy Harris [D] |
Sen. Cameron Henry [R] | Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 442 CONCUR (#977) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#1152) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#428) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#1152) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#428) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 316. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-05-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |