LA SB44 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for workers' compensation insurance premium reductions to certain employers. (8/1/16) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for workers' compensation insurance premium reductions to certain employers. (8/1/16) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#1111) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 470. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-19 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2016-05-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |