LA SB44 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Bogalusa, subject to voter approval, to levy a provider fee on the operation of hospitals within the city that may provide to DHH funding for state expenses for the Medicaid program within the city. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the city of Bogalusa, subject to voter approval, to levy a provider fee on the operation of hospitals within the city that may provide to DHH funding for state expenses for the Medicaid program within the city. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 44 CONCUR (#809) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#695) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#695) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2013. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 222. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |