LA SB439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires in-person trauma-informed training for law enforcement officers. (8/1/24) (EN +$2,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires in-person trauma-informed training for law enforcement officers. (8/1/24) (EN +$2,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#1155) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 AMENDMENT # 2287 BY MIZELL SB 439 BY MIZELL (#347) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 AMENDMENT # 2287 BY MIZELL SB 439 BY MIZELL (#347) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 353. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024. |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-06 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |