LA SB439 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Limits liability of a nonprofit organization or employee for the disclosure of certain information. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits liability of a nonprofit organization or employee for the disclosure of certain information. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 CONCUR (#441) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#471) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 CO-AUTHORS (#190) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#189) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateEffective date 8/1/2020.
2020-06-09SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 123.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB439&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167980
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169669
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177171
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181353
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176354
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167982
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170549
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180251
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172467
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176529
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177134

Bill Comments

feedback