LA SB435 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to certain immunity from civil liability during state of emergencies. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to certain immunity from civil liability during state of emergencies. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 ADOPT (#719) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 435 MOTION TO ADOPT (#761) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 REJECT (#440) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#209) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12SenateEffective date 6/12/2020.
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 362.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-05-31HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-05-31HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stefanski, Gregory Miller, and Pressly.
2020-05-29HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-05-29SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Abraham, McMath, and Peacock.
2020-05-29HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-13SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB435&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167967
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169666
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178942
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182578
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171755
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176230
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167968
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172043
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178643
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178714
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178910

Bill Comments

feedback