LA SB435 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the theft of animals. (8/1/16)
Title
Provides relative to the theft of animals. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 CONCUR (#1302) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#1209) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#625) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#1209) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#625) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 585. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |