LA SB433 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of certain airport commissions. (8/1/22)
Title
Provides relative to the membership of certain airport commissions. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 433 2/3 vote (#1387) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 433 FINAL PASSAGE (#347) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 433 FINAL PASSAGE (#347) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |