LA SB433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 65. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 65. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the membership of the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board. (gov sig)
Title
Provides with respect to the membership of the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 433 FINAL PASSAGE (#1402) (Y: 18 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 433 FINAL PASSAGE (#653) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 433 FINAL PASSAGE (#653) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 65. Failed to pass. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |