LA SB424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Central to expropriate property by declaration for the purpose of maintaining and improving drainage. (gov sig)
Title
Authorizes the city of Central to expropriate property by declaration for the purpose of maintaining and improving drainage. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 424 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 424 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 424 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 229. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |