LA SB422 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the distribution of certain contractor fees to each accredited public university's and community college's school of construction management or construction technology. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the distribution of certain contractor fees to each accredited public university's and community college's school of construction management or construction technology. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. John Milkovich [D] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] | Sen. Michael Walsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 422 CONCUR (#1079) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#829) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#829) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 387. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-04-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |