LA SB42 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes the City Court of Winnsboro and establishes the Mayor's Court for the City of Winnsboro. (1/1/17)
Title
Abolishes the City Court of Winnsboro and establishes the Mayor's Court for the City of Winnsboro. (1/1/17)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2016-04-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |