LA SB42 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to require reargument before a five judge panel prior to reversal or modification of judgments rendered by office of workers' compensation when one judge of the original 3-judge panel dissents. (2/3-CA13s1(A)) (EN NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to require reargument before a five judge panel prior to reversal or modification of judgments rendered by office of workers' compensation when one judge of the original 3-judge panel dissents. (2/3-CA13s1(A)) (EN NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 42, CONCUR (#1931) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 42, FINAL PASSAGE (#1798) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 42, FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 42, FINAL PASSAGE (#1798) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 42, FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2010-07-09 | Becomes Act No. 1051 | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Local and Consent). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-10 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |