LA SB418 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020. (1/1/21) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020. (1/1/21) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 ADOPT (#755) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#754) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 418 MOTION TO ADOPT (#803) (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 REJECT (#644) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#238) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 AMENDMENT # 1600 BY WARD SB 418 BY TALBOT (#237) (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 AMENDMENT # 1581 BY CONNICK SB 418 BY TALBOT (#236) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 AMENDMENT # 1601 BY FIELDS SB 418 BY TALBOT (#235) (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 418 AMENDMENT # 1458 BY FIELDS SB 418 BY TALBOT (#234) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 66, nays 31. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-01HouseHouse conferees appointed: Garofalo, Gregory Miller, and Magee.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Talbot, Peacock, and Ward.
2020-05-31HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2020-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-26HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-26HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-26HouseReported with amendments (10-5-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-05-18SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/18.
2020-05-14SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-13SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB418&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164927
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171815
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173739
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179197
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171686
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172243
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172374
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173442
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173529
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173653
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173625
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173611
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173605
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173589
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173538
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173525
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173469
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173460
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173649
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173640
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173630
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175171
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176069
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177131
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176255
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177795
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164928
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171241
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172071
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173925
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175794
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176059
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179300
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182393
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185258
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173698
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177757
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178347
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179133

Bill Comments

feedback