LA SB406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 73-35-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for rural access to broadband high-speed internet service. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for rural access to broadband high-speed internet service. (gov sig)

Sponsors

Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Patrick McMath [R]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Glen Womack [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]
Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]
Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]
Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]
Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]
Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406 CONCUR (#439) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 406 AMENDMENT # 2703 BY MCFARLAND (#461) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 406 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 406 AMENDMENT # 2519 BY MCMAHEN (#462) (Y: 17 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 406 AMENDMENT # 2703 BY MCFARLAND (#461) (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406 CO-AUTHORS (#185) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406 FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB406&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164332
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169980
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172488
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177257
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170715
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172417
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171572
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171485
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175431
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176410
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176620
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176498
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176662
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164334
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170535
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181951
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177132

Bill Comments

feedback