LA SB405 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 5/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 5/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the acquisition of blighted property in certain municipalities. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the acquisition of blighted property in certain municipalities. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 405 CONCUR (#1268) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#1191) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#1191) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 5/30/2018. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 568. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |