LA SB401 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a commission to study the feasibility of consolidating the Washington Parish and Bogalusa City school systems. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a commission to study the feasibility of consolidating the Washington Parish and Bogalusa City school systems. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 401 FINAL PASSAGE (#887) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 401 FINAL PASSAGE (#129) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413.
2018-05-15SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-14SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-20SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-19SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB401&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073377
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075574
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078072
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096101
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101376
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077656
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077189
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080568
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096508
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095115

Bill Comments

feedback