LA SB400 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the administration of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, public safety services. (1/1/23)
Title
Provides for the administration of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, public safety services. (1/1/23)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 400 CO-AUTHORS (#227) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 400 FINAL PASSAGE (#226) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 400 FINAL PASSAGE (#226) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |