LA SB40 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Boll Weevil Eradication Fund and assessments on cotton producers and provides for the disposition of funds. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Repeals the Boll Weevil Eradication Fund and assessments on cotton producers and provides for the disposition of funds. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#773) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 185. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2019-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |