LA SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to exempt diapers and feminine hygiene products from state sales and use tax. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to exempt diapers and feminine hygiene products from state sales and use tax. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 4 FINAL PASSAGE (#301) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-08SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-05-08SenateRead by title. By a vote of 21 yeas and 12 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
2019-05-08SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-22SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-02-18SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB4&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1112707
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125944
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128620
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128143
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1112708
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122485
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126675
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128044
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129386
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129701
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132742

Bill Comments

feedback