LA SB4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-07 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-07 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to employee and employer contributions under certain circumstances. (7/1/11) (EG INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to employee and employer contributions under certain circumstances. (7/1/11) (EG INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Sen. B.L. Shaw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement. | |
2011-03-11 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement. |