LA SB398 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts video or audio recordings generated by law enforcement body-worn cameras from Public Records Law. (8/1/16)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts video or audio recordings generated by law enforcement body-worn cameras from Public Records Law. (8/1/16)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 398 CONCUR (#1196) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 398 FINAL PASSAGE (#1109) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 398 FINAL PASSAGE (#578) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-13SenateEffective date 8/1/2016.
2016-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 525.
2016-06-03SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2016-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2016-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2016-05-31SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2016-05-31HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
2016-05-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2016-05-18HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2016-05-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2016-05-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-04SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2016-05-02SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-04-27SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-26SenateReported with amendments.
2016-04-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2016-04-04SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=SB398&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=990363
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997653
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000633
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008536
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1012704
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997615
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000369
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004326
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004572
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008092
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008306
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=990365
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=998351
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000759
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004578
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1009111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000557
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008416

Bill Comments

feedback