LA SB397 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to counting absentee and early voting ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to counting absentee and early voting ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 397 CONCUR (#643) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#183) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12SenateEffective date 6/12/2020.
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 354.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-27HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2020-05-07SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB397&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164311
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170026
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178497
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182606
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170769
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176403
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176208
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177619
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164314
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170555
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170833
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172721
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173351
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179089
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172450
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178345

Bill Comments

feedback