LA SB396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and provides for cooperative endeavor agreements between local governmental subdivisions and other entities that may require payments in lieu of ad valorem taxes. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes and provides for cooperative endeavor agreements between local governmental subdivisions and other entities that may require payments in lieu of ad valorem taxes. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 396 CONCUR (#642) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 240. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-05-21 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-05-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |