LA SB395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to false, misleading, or deceptive acts or practices and the award of certain costs and fees to the attorney general. (8/1/20) (RE NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to false, misleading, or deceptive acts or practices and the award of certain costs and fees to the attorney general. (8/1/20) (RE NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 CONCUR (#689) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 RECONSIDER REJECTION (#688) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 CONCUR (#689) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 CONCUR (#688) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 REJECT (#652) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 78 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 395 AMENDMENT # 2764 BY MARCELLE MOTION TO ADOPT (#606) (Y: 38 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 395 AMENDMENT # 2747 BY SEABAUGH (#538) (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 395 AMENDMENT # 2743 BY JOHNSON M. (#537) (Y: 44 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseHouse conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Davis, and Jordan.
2020-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01SenateBy a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01SenateReconsidered.
2020-05-31HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2020-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-28HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-22HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-22HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-21HouseReported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB395&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164306
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169981
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172475
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178715
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169640
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170917
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176933
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176844
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176801
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176944
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176938
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176969
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177737
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177848
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177989
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164308
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170521
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172694
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177101
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181949
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185262
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172445
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177851
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178367
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178677
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179196

Bill Comments

feedback