LA SB392 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to free and unhampered passage on the Tomey J. Doucet Bridge for certain residents. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to free and unhampered passage on the Tomey J. Doucet Bridge for certain residents. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#433) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |