LA SB391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain state agencies to install internet filters to block content which is sexually explicit, pornographic, or sexually harassing. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain state agencies to install internet filters to block content which is sexually explicit, pornographic, or sexually harassing. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 391 CONCUR (#1342) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#1272) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#697) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#1272) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#697) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 669. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-05-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |