LA SB39 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the mislabeling of milk products. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the mislabeling of milk products. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 39 CONCUR (#667) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#733) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#246) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 8/1/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 184.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-22HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-02SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-01SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB39&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117086
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129745
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140586
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143923
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129606
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139811
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139782
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139718
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140007
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117087
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130401
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140461

Bill Comments

feedback