LA SB39 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the requirement for holding public hearings on the highway priority program from the DOTD to the Joint Highway Priority Construction Committee. (8/15/10)
Title
Changes the requirement for holding public hearings on the highway priority program from the DOTD to the Joint Highway Priority Construction Committee. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#808) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 13. | |
2010-05-19 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-06 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-05-05 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported favorably (15-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-15 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-14 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |