LA SB375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail food establishments to maintain and promote community hygiene as part of standardized business practices. (8/1/18) (RE +$75,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Requires retail food establishments to maintain and promote community hygiene as part of standardized business practices. (8/1/18) (RE +$75,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 375 APPROPRIATIONS (#886) (Y: 46 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 375 FINAL PASSAGE (#309) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 375 FINAL PASSAGE (#309) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |