LA SB373 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to unfair or deceptive methods, acts, and practices in the business of personal and commercial lines of insurance. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to unfair or deceptive methods, acts, and practices in the business of personal and commercial lines of insurance. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 373 CONCUR (#614) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#504) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 373 CO-AUTHORS (#225) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12SenateEffective date 8/1/2020.
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 351.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-28SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2020-05-15SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-14SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB373&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164214
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172272
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178007
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182603
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171738
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173909
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174346
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176877
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164217
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172482
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180748
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172862
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176790
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177917

Bill Comments

feedback