LA SB370 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a permit for the entertainment industry for the possession or transportation of certain wildlife. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Creates a permit for the entertainment industry for the possession or transportation of certain wildlife. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - House - House Vote on SB 370, FINAL PASSAGE (#1184) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 370, FINAL PASSAGE (#523) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 370, FINAL PASSAGE (#523) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-05 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 550. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-28 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-24 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-23 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2012. | |
2012-05-23 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (10-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2012-04-26 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-25 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |