LA SB366 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to visitation rights of grandparents and siblings. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to visitation rights of grandparents and siblings. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 366 CONCUR (#1072) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 366 FINAL PASSAGE (#824) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 366 FINAL PASSAGE (#326) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 383.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-24HouseReported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2018-04-10HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-10SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-04SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-03SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB366&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073162
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082050
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096719
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101150
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089230
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088709
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089644
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094592
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073164
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083194
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089638
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101130
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084923
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096501

Bill Comments

feedback