LA SB365 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Vetoed by the Governor on June 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Vetoed by the Governor on June 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the calculation of fuel sales at qualified truck stop facilities. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for the calculation of fuel sales at qualified truck stop facilities. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365, CONCUR (#1545) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 365, FINAL PASSAGE (#1251) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365, FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 365, FINAL PASSAGE (#1251) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365, FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Vetoed by the Governor on June 5, 2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays. | |
2012-05-29 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 39. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-29 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-27 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |