LA SB365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to cooperative purchasing. (8/15/10) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to cooperative purchasing. (8/15/10) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-10 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance. |