LA SB36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to emergency departments. (8/1/19) (RE NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to emergency departments. (8/1/19) (RE NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 36 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1013) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 36 ADOPT (#959) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 36 REJECT (#655) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 36 FINAL PASSAGE (#734) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 36 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-05HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-05HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-04SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-04SenateConference committee report received.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2019-06-03SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Foil.
2019-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Colomb, and Luneau.
2019-06-02HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-22HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-21HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-20SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB36&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116975
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125067
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143327
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123469
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124665
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135944
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136334
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139831
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139813
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139663
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137636
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140029
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116976
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123301
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123859
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124248
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135979
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136317
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124989
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143181

Bill Comments

feedback