LA SB36 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-28 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to continuing education requirements for insurance producers. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to continuing education requirements for insurance producers. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on SB 36 FINAL PASSAGE (#455) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 36 SB 36 BY SMITH J. (#66) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-28SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 15.
2018-04-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-16SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-04-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-05HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-04HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-19SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-15SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-14SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback