LA SB352 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 23 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 23 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires utility providers to issue a credit to customers who experience an outage of service for more than 24 hours. (8/1/22)
Title
Requires utility providers to issue a credit to customers who experience an outage of service for more than 24 hours. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 352 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 23 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |