LA SB35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-28 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-28 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the discretion vested in the commissioner of insurance to levy fines for the violation of complaint directives. (8/1/18) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the discretion vested in the commissioner of insurance to levy fines for the violation of complaint directives. (8/1/18) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 CONCUR (#418) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#65) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#65) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-28 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 14. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018. |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |