LA SB35 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date 6/22/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemptions from arrest and prosecution to persons lawfully in possession of medical marijuana. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides exemptions from arrest and prosecution to persons lawfully in possession of medical marijuana. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#786) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateEffective date 6/22/2017.
2017-06-22SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319.
2017-06-07SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-05SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-06-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended.
2017-06-05HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended.
2017-06-05HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-06-05HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-06-04HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
2017-06-04HouseDischarged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-06-02HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-06-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-05-31SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2017-05-08SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-05-03SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2017-03-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB35&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1025398
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037831
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046612
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049082
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052188
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037763
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038222
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1025399
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1032516
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038564
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039046
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046726
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048524
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050945
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046579
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049054

Bill Comments

feedback