LA SB345 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to noncompete agreements. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to noncompete agreements. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 345 CONCUR (#438) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#460) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#174) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 345 AMENDMENT # 1380 BY MORRIS SB 345 BY JOHNS (#173) (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateEffective date 8/1/2020.
2020-06-09SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 121.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-05-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB345&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163706
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169930
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172038
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177245
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181349
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170561
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171898
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171969
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173406
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173549
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176650
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163721
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170546
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172198
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173523
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180199
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171975
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177129

Bill Comments

feedback