LA SB345 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Feral Hog Task Force. (8/1/16)
Title
Establishes the Feral Hog Task Force. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#176) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-04-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |