LA SB336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the State Licensing Board for Contractors. (8/1/16) (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the State Licensing Board for Contractors. (8/1/16) (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 336 FINAL PASSAGE (#180) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2016-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-04-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |