LA SB335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for penalties for persons convicted for soliciting prostitutes. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for penalties for persons convicted for soliciting prostitutes. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 335 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1384) (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 ADOPT (#1310) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 REJECT (#1069) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#944) (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 335 AMENDMENT # 3955 BY MARCELLE MOTION TO ADOPT (#943) (Y: 42 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 CO-AUTHORS (#258) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 663.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2018-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18.
2018-05-17HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-17HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2018-05-16SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2018-05-16HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stokes, Mack, and Hodges.
2018-05-16HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2018-05-16SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Mizell, Claitor, and Barrow.
2018-05-14HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
2018-04-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-26HouseReported favorably (9-6-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-21SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-20SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB335&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072621
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076923
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083106
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095931
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103654
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077816
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079257
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092671
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093784
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095507
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095578
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095975
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072647
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077887
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083298
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077920
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098486
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102223
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083025
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083029
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095599
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096488
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098821
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099413

Bill Comments

feedback