LA SB331 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a ten-year renewable period for issuance cost of hang tags for persons with mobility impairments. (8/1/18) (EN +$275,216 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for a ten-year renewable period for issuance cost of hang tags for persons with mobility impairments. (8/1/18) (EN +$275,216 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#823) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 331 CO-AUTHORS (#126) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 331 CO-AUTHORS (#126) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 240. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |