LA SB325 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to judicial building fund as it relates to juvenile court matters and certain child welfare proceedings. (7/1/16) (RE +$45,800 LF RV See Note)
Title
Makes changes to judicial building fund as it relates to juvenile court matters and certain child welfare proceedings. (7/1/16) (RE +$45,800 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#1022) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2016-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |