LA SB320 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the use of the title of "Doctor" or the abbreviation "Dr." by certain healthcare providers. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for the use of the title of "Doctor" or the abbreviation "Dr." by certain healthcare providers. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 320, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1572) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, ADOPT (#1741) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, REJECT (#1577) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, CONCUR (#1576) (Y: 6 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 320, FINAL PASSAGE (#1311) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 320, AMENDMENT # 500 BY LANDRY, N., MOTION TO ADOPT (#1310) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, FINAL PASSAGE (#595) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, ADOPT (#1741) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, REJECT (#1577) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, CONCUR (#1576) (Y: 6 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 320, FINAL PASSAGE (#1311) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 320, AMENDMENT # 500 BY LANDRY, N., MOTION TO ADOPT (#1310) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 320, FINAL PASSAGE (#595) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-12 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 772. | |
2012-06-12 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-04 | Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 77, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2012-06-04 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays. | |
2012-06-04 | Conference Committee report received. | |
2012-06-01 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2012-06-01 | House conferees appointed: Simon, Garofalo, and Nancy Landry. | |
2012-05-31 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-31 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Heitmeier, and Dorsey-Colomb. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-30 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |