LA SB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes boards and commissions, authorities, districts, and like entities that are inactive. (8/1/18) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Abolishes boards and commissions, authorities, districts, and like entities that are inactive. (8/1/18) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 319 ADOPT (#1401) (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 319 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1409) (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 319 REJECT (#1340) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 319 FINAL PASSAGE (#1297) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 319 AMENDMENT # 4628 BY BAGNERIS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1197) (Y: 39 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 319 FINAL PASSAGE (#442) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 319 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1409) (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 319 REJECT (#1340) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 319 FINAL PASSAGE (#1297) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 319 AMENDMENT # 4628 BY BAGNERIS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1197) (Y: 39 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 319 FINAL PASSAGE (#442) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 661. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 20 yeas and 5 nays. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 75, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Shadoin, Pugh, and Zeringue. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gatti, Peterson, and Milkovich. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |