LA SB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires mayors who are authorized to conduct mayor's court or municipal court to undergo certain training. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Requires mayors who are authorized to conduct mayor's court or municipal court to undergo certain training. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#1482) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 691. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice given. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Notice given. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2022-03-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |